This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 23:08:49 (UTC).

MARADELLE SAKEMILLER, ET AL. VS EDISON INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 MARADELLE SAKEMILLER filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against EDISON INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9236

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAKEMILLER MARADELLE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOXER DOUGLAS

WATTS MIKAL C.

Defendant Attorney

DIXON DOUGLAS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

6/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...) OF 10/01/2021

10/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...) OF 10/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...) OF 10/01/2021

10/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...) OF 10/01/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER DATED OCTOBER 1, 2021

10/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER DATED OCTOBER 1, 2021

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

12/28/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...) OF 02/01/2022

2/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...) OF 02/01/2022

Initial Status Conference Order

2/1/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND SETTING INITIAL STATUS CO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE;)

2/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

Status Report

9/29/2021: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 07/21/2021

7/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 07/21/2021

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Initial Status Confe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Verified Application of Mikal C. Watts to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Mikal C. Watts); Filed by Mikal C. Watts (Attorney); Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 11:14 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 06/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maradelle Sakemiller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON DOUGLAS JAMES