Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 13:55:09 (UTC).

MAR VISTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ITS CONSTITUENT HOMEOWNERS VS HADIA EL-BARDISY

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 MAR VISTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ITS CONSTITUENT HOMEOWNERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HADIA EL-BARDISY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7255

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAR VISTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ITS CONSTITUENT HOMEOWNERS

SERRANO JOHNNY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EL-BARDISY HADIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

VOSS DAVID CRAIN JR

Defendant Attorneys

SAFARIAN HARRY A

SAFARIAN HARRY A.

MOEST ROBERT C.

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

2/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Objection - OBJECTION TO ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO VARIOUS DECLARATIONS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJ

1/5/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO VARIOUS DECLARATIONS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJ

Substitution of Attorney

2/1/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/29/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/29/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEANA SAUNDERS-MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEANA SAUNDERS-MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LESLEY B. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LESLEY B. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JADIE ON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JADIE ON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HADIA EL-BARDISY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HADIA EL-BARDISY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF JADIE ON

12/31/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF JADIE ON

Request for Judicial Notice

12/31/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF DEANA SAUNDERS-MEDINAIN

12/31/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF DEANA SAUNDERS-MEDINAIN

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/11/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Johnny Serrano (Cross-Defendant); Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF HARRY A. SAFARIAN PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41); Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hadia El-Bardisy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injunction) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Ord...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOrder (on Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mar Vista Homeowners Association, individually and on behalf of its constituent homeowners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAR VISTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ITS CONSTITUENT HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOSS DAVID CRAIN