This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 15:36:28 (UTC).

MANYA VARDANYAN VS ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 MANYA VARDANYAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0562

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARDANYAN MANYA

Defendants

ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE AKA GLENDALE ADVENTIST HOSPITAL

LEE M.D. SZE-CHING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE MONROE

Defendant Attorney

MARTINO ALEXANDRA CONCETTA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

10/13/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

10/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/13/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

9/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Per 177.5 CCP Against Plaintiff's Counsel For His Failure to Appear on 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Per 177.5 CCP Against Plaintiff's Counsel For His Failure to Appear on 01/30/2023 scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDeclaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF RIGHTLY A. PERRY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE (Defendant); Service Date: 09/14/2022; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE (Defendant); SZE-CHING LEE M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE (Defendant); SZE-CHING LEE M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MANYA VARDANYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE (Defendant); SZE-CHING LEE M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUNCH, BRUCE M