Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 11:26:57 (UTC).

MANUSHAK TOROSYAN, ET AL. VS TRAPP AUTO RECOVERY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 MANUSHAK TOROSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAPP AUTO RECOVERY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9669

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOROSYAN MANUSHAK

Defendants

GRANDVIEW FINANCIAL SERVICES

CAR CITY

TRAPP AUTO RECOVERY

DOVER NICK

DOVER HARRY

DOVER DOE 2 HARRY

DOVER DOE 1 NICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUTLAND FREEMAN MATTHEW

BUTLAND FREEMAN MATTHEW ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KESHISHIAN ARNO HILL

ALDERMAN DANIEL S.

KESHISHIAN ARNO HILL ESQ.

ALDERMAN DANIEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING STATUS OF PETITION FOR APPROVA...) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING STATUS OF PETITION FOR APPROVA...) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING STATUS OF PETITION FOR APPROVA...)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING STATUS OF PETITION FOR APPROVA...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MANUSHAK TOROSYAN WITH REEGARD TO MINOR'S COMPROMISE

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MANUSHAK TOROSYAN WITH REEGARD TO MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);) OF 12/11/2020

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);) OF 12/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

Substitution of Attorney

5/20/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/2/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GRIGOR

7/18/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GRIGOR

Answer

5/22/2019: Answer

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: GRIGOR

4/16/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: GRIGOR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/21/2019: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance/Proof of Deposit Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing Status of Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Filing Status of Petition for Approva...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Filing Status of Petition for Approva...) of 03/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Trapp Auto Recovery (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Grigor); Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Trapp Auto Recovery (Defendant); Grandview Financial Services (Defendant); Car City (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad litem re: Grigor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manushak Torosyan (Plaintiff); Grigor Zhamkochyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANDVIEW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JOSALAN LLC DBA CAR CITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLAND FREEMAN MATTHEW