This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 03:00:40 (UTC).

MANUEL SANCHEZ, ET AL. VS LA AMAPOLA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 MANUEL SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY MOHR and MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1817

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANTHONY MOHR

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ MANUEL

NORIEGA MARIA

Defendants

LA AMAPOLA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GALVAN CARLOS B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KINLEY MATTHEW L.

KINLEY MATTHEW LANE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/01/2021

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/01/2021

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL) OF 12/11/2020

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL) OF 12/11/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES

5/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/19/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/19/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/19/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

4/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

11/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Motion to Quash Notice to Appear) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by La Amapola, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manuel Sanchez (Plaintiff); Maria Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIHU KAVEH SAM