This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 16:19:11 (UTC).

MANUEL RODRIGUEZ VS NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 MANUEL RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0766

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ MANUEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC. A CORPORATION

MUHAMMAD SANDRA DBA MODERN PROTECTION

Cross Defendant

MUHAMMAD SANDRA DBA MODERN PROTECTION A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN ORIGIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIN PARAG L.

Defendant Attorneys

REEVES MESSNER WILLIAM

ARENS RUSSELL R

Cross Defendant Attorney

MONROE SCOTT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/24/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DATE OF INCIDENT

2/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DATE OF INCIDENT

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/14/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/20/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

8/20/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

6/9/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/2/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Scott William Monroe (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sandra Muhammad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DATE OF INCIDENT); Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Manuel Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC. DBA NICOLA'S GENTLEMEN'S CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONROE SCOTT WILLIAM