This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 00:10:02 (UTC).

MANUEL ESPINOZA SICAIROS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 MANUEL ESPINOZA SICAIROS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3883

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SICAIROS MANUEL ESPINOZA

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK MEET SINGH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

Answer

9/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Manuel Espinoza Sicairos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manuel Espinoza Sicairos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manuel Espinoza Sicairos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Manuel Espinoza Sicairos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YANG MICHELLE