This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 03:20:32 (UTC).

MANUEL CHAVEZ, ET AL. VS GERMAN CORONEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 MANUEL CHAVEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERMAN CORONEL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3259

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVEZ MANUEL

SORIANO ALEJANDRA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CORONEL GERMAN

CORONEL DEMOLITION INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LAWLESS KEVIN

BOYD KURT

IBARRA STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/25/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

2/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Notice of Ruling

2/7/2022: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Consolidate

12/10/2021: Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Related Case

11/2/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

11/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

Notice of Continuance

11/15/2021: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/17/2021

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/17/2021

Notice of Related Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

11/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

Notice of Ruling

11/23/2021: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

10/6/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

8/17/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Coronel Demolition, Inc. on 06/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Coronel Demolition, Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Coronel Demolition, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: ROES 1-100 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Manuel Chavez, et al. on 01/27/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Manuel Chavez and Alejandra Soriano as to German Coronel and Coronel Demolition, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff); Alejandra Soriano (Plaintiff); As to: German Coronel (Defendant); Coronel Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Because there is a cross-complaint filed, a request for dismissal of the entire action must include the signature of the cross-complainant/attorney of record for cross-complainant (see Section 2).: Name Extension: Not Entered - Because there is a cross-complaint filed, a request for dismissal of the entire action must include the signature of the cross-complainant/attorney of record for cross-complainant (see Section 2). As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2733478 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2733479 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff); Alejandra Soriano (Plaintiff); As to: German Coronel (Defendant); Coronel Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff); Alejandra Soriano (Plaintiff); As to: German Coronel (Defendant); Coronel Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff); Alejandra Soriano (Plaintiff); As to: German Coronel (Defendant); Coronel Demolition, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******3259 Hearing Date: February 4, 2022 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MANUEL CHAVEZ, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GERMAN CORONEL, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: *******3259

(Related to Case No. 20STLC07290)

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

February 4, 2022

On January 27, 2021, Manuel Chavez and Alejandra Soriano filed this action (the “Chavez Action”) against defendants German Coronel (“Coronel”) and Coronel Demolition, Inc. arising from a multi-vehicle automobile collision occurring on November 24, 2019.

On August 27, 2020, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed an action against Coronel (the “State Farm Action”) arising from the same automobile accident.

On November 17, 2021, the Court deemed the Chavez Action and the State Farm Action to be related and ordered the Chavez Action to be the lead case. On December 10, 2021, Coronel filed this motion to consolidate the two actions. The motion is unopposed.

“When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.” (Code Civ. Proc. 1048, subd. (a).) The purpose of consolidation is to enhance trial court efficiency by avoiding unnecessary duplication of evidence and the danger of inconsistent adjudications. (See Todd-Stenberg v. Dalkon Shield Claimants Trust (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 976, 978-979.)

The motion for consolidation is procedurally deficient because no notice of motion to consolidate was filed in the State Farm Action. However, both matters are before this Court and the Court notes that a stipulation and proposed order to relate and consolidate actions was filed in the State Farm Action on January 12, 2022.

Therefore, the Court will waive the technical deficiency and GRANT the Motion to Consolidate.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue.



b'

Case Number: *******3259 Hearing Date: November 23, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MANUEL CHAVEZ, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GERMAN CORONEL, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: *******3259

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

November 23, 2021

On January 27, 2021, Plaintiffs Manuel Chavez (“Plaintiff”) and Alejandra Soriano filed this action against Defendant German Coronel (“Defendant”) and Coronel Demolition, Inc.

On April 22, 2021, Plaintiff served Requests for Admissions (Set One) on Defendant. (Ibarra Decl., Ex. A.) On June 9, 2021, Defendant requested a 30-day extension to provide responses; Plaintiff offered a two-week extension but maintained that objections were waived. (Ibarra Decl., ¶¶ 7-9.) Plaintiff’s counsel’s office followed up on June 22, 2021, but did not receive any response. Plaintiff subsequently filed this Motion on August 17, 2021.

Where a party fails to timely respond to a request for admission, the propounding party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (b).) The party who failed to respond waives any objections to the demand, unless the court grants them relief from the waiver, upon a showing that the party (1) has subsequently served a substantially compliant response, and (2) that the party’s failure to respond was the result of mistake, inadvertence, or excusable neglect. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subds. (a)(1)-(2).)

A court shall grant a motion to deem admitted requests for admissions, “unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

The hearing on this matter was continued to this date from November 10, 2021. The Court ordered Defendant to submit a supplemental declaration supporting his opposition to Plaintiff’s motion to deem admitted. In the supplemental declaration, defense counsel explains that he inadvertently failed to scan the verifications for the responses to the requests for admission when he served them on July 6, 2021. (Boyd Decl., ¶¶ 4-5, Ex. A.) Defense counsel attaches the written discovery responses with the missing verification, as well as the other responses to written discovery and their respective verifications to show that the failure to include the verification was inadvertent. (Id., Ex. C.) Defense counsel also states that Plaintiff’s counsel confirmed his receipt of these discovery responses and that the only address of record he has been provided is the one on the pleadings, such that the discovery responses were sent to the address represented by Plaintiff’s counsel to be accurate. (Id., ¶ 12, Ex. D.)

Defendant has sufficiently shown that substantially compliant responses were served prior to the hearing on this motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff’s motion is DENIED.

The Code of Civil Procedure provides that where a party fails to provide a timely response to requests for admission, “[i]t is mandatory that the court impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) on the party or attorney, or both, whose failure to serve a timely response to requests for admission necessitated this motion.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

It is undisputed that Defendant’s responses are untimely. Therefore, Plaintiff’s request for sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Defendant and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $435, consisting of 1 hour at Plaintiff’s counsel’s hourly rate of $375 and a $60 filing fee, to be paid within 20 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue.

'


b'

Case Number: *******3259 Hearing Date: November 10, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MANUEL CHAVEZ, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GERMAN CORONEL, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: *******3259

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

November 10, 2021

On January 27, 2021, Plaintiffs Manuel Chavez (“Plaintiff”) and Alejandra Soriano filed this action against Defendant German Coronel (“Defendant”) and Coronel Demolition, Inc.

On April 22, 2021, Plaintiff served Requests for Admissions (Set One) on Defendant. (Ibarra Decl., Ex. A.) On June 9, 2021, Defendant requested a 30-day extension to provide responses; Plaintiff offered a two-week extension but maintained that objections were waived. (Ibarra Decl., ¶¶ 7-9.) Plaintiff’s counsel’s office followed up on June 22, 2021, but did not receive any response. Plaintiff subsequently filed this Motion on August 17, 2021.

Where a party fails to timely respond to a request for admission, the propounding party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (b).) The party who failed to respond waives any objections to the demand, unless the court grants them relief from the waiver, upon a showing that the party (1) has subsequently served a substantially compliant response, and (2) that the party’s failure to respond was the result of mistake, inadvertence, or excusable neglect. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subds. (a)(1)-(2).)

A court shall grant a motion to deem admitted requests for admissions, “unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

Defendant opposes the motion on the grounds that responses were already served on July 6, 2021. Defendant attaches responses to counsel’s declaration as Exhibit A. However, the responses do not include a verification. Accordingly, the responses served are not substantially compliant. Accordingly, Plaintiff’s Motion is GRANTED.

The Code of Civil Procedure provides that where a party fails to provide a timely response to requests for admission, “[i]t is mandatory that the court impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) on the party or attorney, or both, whose failure to serve a timely response to requests for admission necessitated this motion.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).) Plaintiff’s request for sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Defendant and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $435, consisting of 1 hour at Plaintiff’s counsel’s hourly rate of $375 and a $60 filing fee.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue.

'