This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:34:44 (UTC).

MANUEL CAMILO II GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MARY LYNN DOLAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MANUEL CAMILO II GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARY LYNN DOLAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6296

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

II GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL MANUEL CAMILO

Defendant

DOLAN AN INDIVIDUAL MARY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAHOUDAI YOSI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2024
  • Hearing09/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MANUEL CAMILO II GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MANUEL CAMILO II GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MANUEL CAMILO II GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAHOUDAI YOSI ESQ.