This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 01:37:28 (UTC).

MANNHEIM, MICHAEL VS MANNHEIM, LAUREN

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 MANNHEIM, MICHAEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANNHEIM, LAUREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6658

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANNHEIM MICHAEL

Respondent

MANNHEIM LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

Respondent Attorney

LEICHTER ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/20/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

6/17/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons - Summons

6/17/2022: Summons - Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/17/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/29/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

7/28/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

7/28/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

Proof of Service - PROOF OF SERVICE RE RESPONDENT???S RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; RESPONDENT???S DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

7/28/2022: Proof of Service - PROOF OF SERVICE RE RESPONDENT???S RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; RESPONDENT???S DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (PROOF OF SERVICE RE RESPONDENT???S RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; RESPONDENT???S DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Civil Case Cover Sheet ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F