This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 05:21:44 (UTC).

MANLIN, ROGER A.S. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 MANLIN, ROGER A S - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARCIA, RUBEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0854

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARCIA, RUBEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANLIN SCOTT

Claimants

103 B STREET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

120 E. CHURCH AVE. LLC

1220 NADEAU ST. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1562 SEABRIGHT AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILTY COMPANY

157 EAST PANAMA ROAD LLC

1615 N. DOWNS LLC

6363 LINDBERGH LLC

921 W. INYOKERN ROAD LLC

ANN S. LEE

GREGG A. MARTIN

HAMBURG KARIC EDWARDS & MARTIN LLP

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

STEVE MILNER

Decedent

MANLIN ROGER A.S.

Interested Party

JOHNSTON GERALDINE

Not Classified By Court

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KHACHIKYAN ARPINE

Decedent Attorney

MOTEN KEITH JOSEPH

Interested Party Attorney

SMITH PAUL KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Withdrawal - Special Notice

8/29/2023: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

8/29/2023: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim_Satisfied Chase 0491

8/23/2023: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim_Satisfied Chase 0491

Notice - Notice re Motion to Be Relieved

7/28/2023: Notice - Notice re Motion to Be Relieved

Notice - Notice re MTBR off calendar

6/30/2023: Notice - Notice re MTBR off calendar

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $415,882.46 - Geraldine Johnston

5/24/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $415,882.46 - Geraldine Johnston

Proof of Service - Re: Creditors Claim On Scott Manlin

5/4/2023: Proof of Service - Re: Creditors Claim On Scott Manlin

Creditor's Claim - $415,882.46 plus interest

4/25/2023: Creditor's Claim - $415,882.46 plus interest

Request - Special Notice

4/25/2023: Request - Special Notice

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim - Satisfaction re Amex

4/24/2023: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim - Satisfaction re Amex

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - Inyokern

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - Inyokern

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - Lindbergh LLC

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - Lindbergh LLC

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $1,621,747.00 - 103 B Street LLC

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $1,621,747.00 - 103 B Street LLC

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim was rejected for $1,182,372.62 - Steve Milner

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim was rejected for $1,182,372.62 - Steve Milner

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Rejected $100,000 Ann S. Lee

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Rejected $100,000 Ann S. Lee

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - 1220 Nadeau

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - 1220 Nadeau

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - 1615 N. Downs LLC

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $300,000.00 - 1615 N. Downs LLC

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $100,000.00 - Hamburg, Karic, Edwards, & Martin LLC

4/20/2023: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Claim is rejected for $100,000.00 - Hamburg, Karic, Edwards, & Martin LLC

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/14/2024

Hearing05/14/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketWithdrawal - Special Notice; Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketWithdrawal - Creditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketWithdrawal - Creditor's Claim (Creditors Claim_Satisfied Chase 0491 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketNotice (Notice re Motion to Be Relieved ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketNotice (Notice re MTBR off calendar ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) (Claim is rejected for $415,882.46 - Geraldine Johnston ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketProof of Service (Re: Creditors Claim On Scott Manlin ); Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketCreditor's Claim ($415,882.46 plus interest ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
11/15/2022

DocketSupplement (Supplement to special ltrs ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketEx Parte - Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketDeclaration (Declaration ISO ex parte ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketEx Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition for letters of special administration with general powers ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketPetition - Letters of Special Admin w/Gen Powers (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less