This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 03:27:55 (UTC).

MANHATTAN BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS MONTESSORI SCHOOL OF MANHATTAN BEACH

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 MANHATTAN BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MONTESSORI SCHOOL OF MANHATTAN BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MANHATTAN BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MONTESSORI SCHOOL OF MANHATTAN BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN M

Defendant Attorney

TOOMEY PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

3/29/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/26/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Settlement Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Montessori School of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Montessori School of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Answer to Unverified First Amended Complaint; Filed by Montessori School of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manhattan Beach Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANHATTAN BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTESSORI SCHOOL OF MANHATTAN BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN MATTHEW