This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 13:09:40 (UTC).

MANDY STYLES VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MANDY STYLES filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7105

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STYLES MANDY

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

BRAVO EDUARDO A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/27/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

1/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

1/23/2023: Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/04/2023

1/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/04/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

12/28/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/27/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America (Defendant); As to: Mandy Styles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Volkswagen Group of America (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation to Volkswagen Group of America

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/04/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Kevin Y. Jacobson, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mandy Styles (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mandy Styles (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mandy Styles (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bravo, Eduardo A