This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 03:31:44 (UTC).

MANARD PRYOR JR VS DAVID KHA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 MANARD PRYOR JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID KHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4172

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRYOR MANARD JR.

Defendants and Respondents

KHA KIM NGOC

HONDA LEASE TRUST

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

KHA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CRUZ RAQUEL

HARRISON BRYAN JAMES

HARRISON BRYAN JAMES ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NEILL BRIAN P. ESQ.

SULLIVAN PAUL F.

SULLIVAN PAUL F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/11/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Order - Dismissal

3/2/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT DAVID KHA'S MOTION TO BE DISMISSED FROM ...)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT DAVID KHA'S MOTION TO BE DISMISSED FROM ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - (AS TO REMAINING DEFENDANT HONDA L...) OF 04/09/2021

4/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - (AS TO REMAINING DEFENDANT HONDA L...) OF 04/09/2021

Order - Dismissal

4/9/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - (AS TO REMAINING DEFENDANT HONDA L...)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - (AS TO REMAINING DEFENDANT HONDA L...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/13/2020

7/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/13/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Substitution of Attorney

4/22/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/9/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIA...)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIA...)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/17/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

2/15/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to Response or Entry of Default pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110(g)/Entry of Default Judgment pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110(h)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (- (as to Remaining Defendant Honda Lease Trust)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference - (as to Remaining Defendant Honda L...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference - (as to Remaining Defendant Honda L...) of 04/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (- (as to Remaining Defendant Honda Lease Trust)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference - (as to Remaining Defendant Honda L...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss); Filed by David Kha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference - (as to Remaining Defendant Honda L...) of 03/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Defendant David Kha (CCP Section 2030.010 et. seq.)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manard, Jr. Pryor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manard, Jr. Pryor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manard, Jr. Pryor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Manard, Jr. Pryor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manard, Jr. Pryor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694172    Hearing Date: January 12, 2021    Dept: 29

BC694172 Manard Pryor, Jr. v. David Kha, et al.

The unopposed Motion by Defendant, David Kha to Compel Plaintiff’s Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two; Request for Sanctions is GRANTED.

Plaintiff Manard Pryor, Jr. is ordered to serve verified responses without objection to the foregoing discovery served on Plaintiff on 8/20/20. (Code Civil Procedure § 2030.290, § 2031.300.) The responses must be served within 20 days of notice of this order.

The Court imposes total sanctions of $211.65 against Plaintiff, Manard Pryor, Jr., for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure §2023.010(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC694172    Hearing Date: January 07, 2021    Dept: 29

BC694172 Pryor v. Kha, et al.

Two Motions by Defendant David Kha to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Supplemental Interrogatories, Set One, and Supplemental Demand for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED.

Plaintiff Manard Pryor, Jr. is ordered to serve verified responses without objection to the foregoing discovery served on Plaintiff on 8/20/20. (Code Civ. Proc. § 2030.290, § 2031.300.) The responses are to be served within 20 days of notice of this order.

The Court imposes total sanctions for both motions of $423.30 against Plaintiff Manard Pryor, Jr. for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery which is discovery abuse. (Code Civ. Proc. § 2023.010, subd. (d).)

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA LEASE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEILL BRIAN P.