This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 19:02:35 (UTC).

MAMI MARTINEZ, ET AL. VS MAKI GRUNINGER

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 MAMI MARTINEZ filed an Other lawsuit against MAKI GRUNINGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9311

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES

MARTINEZ MAMI

CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES AGENCY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

GRUNINGER MAKI AKA MAKI MARTINEZ GRUNINGER AKA MAKI YOSHINO GRUNINGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANKLIN SIOBHAN ANNE

WILFERT JARROD M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Hearing03/04/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Hearing03/04/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 4:17 PM in Department 39; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Ex Parte Application to extend Seal and Time to ...) of 02/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Ex Parte Application to extend Seal and Time to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketIn Camera Declaration of Siobhan A Franklin in Support of Ex Parte Application to Extend Seal and Time to Intervene; Filed by State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to extend Seal and Time to Intervene Pursuant to Government Code Section 12652; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support); Filed by State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder Extending Seal and Time to Intervene Pursuant to Government Code Section 12652, Subdivision (c)(5); Filed by State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mami Martinez (Plaintiff); State of California (Plaintiff); California Department of Social Services (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mami Martinez (Plaintiff); State of California (Plaintiff); California Department of Social Services (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILFERT JARROD M.