This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2021 at 04:17:18 (UTC).

MALLARI, LEY VS MALLARI, RODRIGO

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 MALLARI, LEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MALLARI, RODRIGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1849

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALLARI LEY

Respondent

MALLARI RODRIGO

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

12/7/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/7/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

12/3/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/3/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

12/3/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Proof of Service of Summons

1/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Rejection

2/23/2021: Notice - Rejection

Request - Enter Default FL165 - REJECTED. Judgment Package Returned.

2/22/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - REJECTED. Judgment Package Returned.

Notice - Rejection - judgment package received 03/15/21

3/26/2021: Notice - Rejection - judgment package received 03/15/21

Request - Enter Default FL165

3/15/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Notice - Rejection - FL-165 Request to Enter Default (Conformed Copy) rcd 3/05/21

3/5/2021: Notice - Rejection - FL-165 Request to Enter Default (Conformed Copy) rcd 3/05/21

Declaration - Default FL170

3/15/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

3/15/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

3/15/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Notice - Rejection - judgment package rec. 04/07/21

4/15/2021: Notice - Rejection - judgment package rec. 04/07/21

Notice - Entry of Judgment

5/11/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

5/11/2021: Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (judgment package rec. 04/07/21 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (judgment package received 03/15/21 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (FL-165 Request to Enter Default (Conformed Copy) rcd 3/05/21 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (REJECTED. Judgment Package Returned. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less