This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:14:32 (UTC).

MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH VS CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7519

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Defendants

LUDWIG CONSTRUCTION

CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION INC.

JS GLASS & MIRROR INC.

SBBK INC.

DALY AMERICA

DAN VAN RIPER/VAN RIPER LAW GROUP

WELLBROCK. JEFF

VALLEY PACIFIC MASONRY

DOMINY + ASSOCIATES LLP

DOMUSSTUDIO ARCHITECTURE

WELLBROCK BUILDERS

JEFF WELLBROCK.

CHANNEL ISLANDS ROOFING INC.

LUDWIG ROBERT

ANACAPA DRYWALL SPECIALISTS INC.

WOODBROCK ALLAM R.

ZOES 1-100

DALY GARY

PROSPEC INC.

ROGER H. PROULX & COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION INC.

JS GLASS & MIRROR INC.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

PENDLETON MARY B.

EDWARDS MICHAEL M.

CERCOS THEODORE R.

BARGER GLENN T.

STEINBERG JODY

CLAYTON T. GRAHAM

JACOBSEN & MCELROY

LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS

LONDON FISCHER LLP

CATHERINE LAGMAN-LEGASPI ESQ.

RHODES BRIAN WESLEY

LAGMAN-LEGASPI CATHERINE CLAIRE

COHEN ADRIENNE DEE

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

FISCHER TEMRE LEE

BOOTH EILEEN T.

GROSFELD ROBERT

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BOOTH EILEEN T.

Other Attorneys

HILLSHAFER ROBERT D.

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate

4/5/2018: Certificate

Summons

4/5/2018: Summons

Complaint

4/5/2018: Complaint

Legacy Document

4/27/2018: Legacy Document

Answer

5/29/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/29/2018: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/31/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

5/31/2018: Answer

Answer

6/1/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/1/2018: Cross-Complaint

Legacy Document

6/11/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/15/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Personal Service

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder (Regarding Modified Case Management Order Timeline); Filed by CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (of Letter to Clerk of Court - [Proposed] Order Regarding Modified Case Management Order Timeline); Filed by CHARLES LICHA CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Prospec, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SBBK, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
293 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (ON BEHALF OF: JEFF WELLBROCK DBA WELLBROCK BUILDERS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Wellbrock. Jeff (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 101 JEFF WELLBROCK dba WELLBROCK BUILDERS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCertificate (of Merit); Filed by MALIBU PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROSPEC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHANNEL ISLANDS ROOFING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JS GLASS & MIRROR INC. is a litigant