This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 00:15:56 (UTC).

MALEKO TOFIGA, ET AL. VS JAVIER ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 MALEKO TOFIGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAVIER ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3415

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOFIGA MALEKO

TOFIGA SIULI

Defendant

ESTRADA JAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUBLETTE CAMM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/1/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/24/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2024
  • Hearing06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maleko Tofiga (Plaintiff); Siuli Tofiga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maleko Tofiga (Plaintiff); Siuli Tofiga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maleko Tofiga (Plaintiff); Siuli Tofiga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maleko Tofiga (Plaintiff); Siuli Tofiga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM