This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:18:30 (UTC).

MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLP VS JON PFEIFFER, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLP filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JON PFEIFFER, ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8419

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALEK MATTHEW

MALEK MEDIA GROUP LLC

Defendants

TUREN KEVIN

PHANTOM FOUR FILMS

FOURNIER KEN

AXQG CORP.

PFEIFFER JON

SALAFIA FRANCESCA

GOU ANITA

ARROWHEAD INVESTMENTS LLC

FILMS PHANTOM FOUR

Other

PFEIFFER LAW CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KONVITZ JEFFREY

Defendant Attorneys

PARKER MILLS LLP

REYNOLDS JEREMIAH T.

PFEIFFER LAW CORP

PFEIFFER JON ARNOLD

 

Court Documents

Summons

11/27/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/27/2017: Complaint

Answer

1/2/2018: Answer

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition and Objections to proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction); Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition and Objection to proposed Jdugment and Permanent Injunctions); Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Entry of Judgment and Preliminary Injunction) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Supplemental Dec. lf Jeffrey Konvitz in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment); Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judg...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opp. to AXQG Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment); Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JEREMIAH T. REYNOLDS); Filed by AXQG CORP. (Defendant); KEN FOURNIER (Defendant); ANITA GOU (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging of Judgment and Permanent Injunction); Filed by AXQG CORP. (Defendant); KEN FOURNIER (Defendant); ANITA GOU (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION FOLLOWING RULING CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by AXQG CORP. (Defendant); KEN FOURNIER (Defendant); ANITA GOU (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); MATTHEW MALEK (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); MATTHEW MALEK (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JON PFEIFFER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); MATTHEW MALEK (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MALEK MEDIA GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); MATTHEW MALEK (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8419    Hearing Date: June 22, 2020    Dept: O

Case Name: Malek Media Group, LLP v. Pfeiffer, et al.

Consolidated w/: Comerica Bank v. AXQG, et al. (19SMCV01237)

Case No.: ****8419

Complaint Filed: 11-27-17

Hearing Date: 6-22-20 (cnt. 3-5-20)

Discovery C/O: None

Calendar No.: 9

Discover Motion C/O: None

POS: OK

Trial Date: None

SUBJECT: MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Defendant AXQG Corp.

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Malek Media Group, LLC and Matthew Malek

REVISED TENTATIVE RULING

Defendant AXQG Corp.’s Motion to Enforce Judgment is GRANTED on the condition AXOG post a bond as indicated in its proposed order filed June 15, 2020.

It is indisputable that under the judgment, AXOG is entitled to the interpleded fund. Plaintiff’s claim to the fund is revived only if the judgment is reversed. The Court agrees with the authority and reasoning stated by AXOG in its memorandum in support of its Exparte Application filed May 12, 2020 and Reply and incorporates all of that authority and reasoning herein by reference. Simply put, the Court finds it does have clear authority to enforce the judgment in this manner and that in doing so it preserves all rights Plaintiff would have to the interpleded fund if the judgment confirming the arbitration award is reversed.

THE PARTIES ARE STRONGLY ENCOURAGED TO REMOTELY APPEAR AT HEARING THROUGH COURTCALL.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROWHEAD INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PFEIFFER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE WILLIAM PFEIFFER FAMILY TRUST WILLIAM is a litigant