This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 09:01:38 (UTC).

MAKOWKA, BRYNA EILEEN VS CZAJKOWSKI, ALEX

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 MAKOWKA, BRYNA EILEEN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CZAJKOWSKI, ALEX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, PATRICIA A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3030

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOUNG, PATRICIA A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAKOWKA BRYNA EILEEN

Respondent

CZAJKOWSKI ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ELKADDOUM ROCKY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/10/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

6/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO - Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

5/27/2022: Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO - Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) - Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

5/27/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) - Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

5/20/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/20/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/20/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/20/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

5/20/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service

6/13/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

8/12/2022: Minute Order

Response - Civil Harassment (violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

8/8/2022: Response - Civil Harassment (violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service of Response by Mail

8/5/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service of Response by Mail

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Young, Patricia A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (violence) (Response - Civil Harassment (violence) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service of Response by Mail ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO (Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) (Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less