This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2019 at 00:15:35 (UTC).

MAKO SICA FUND LLC ET AL VS BDO USA LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 MAKO SICA FUND LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against BDO USA LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID SOTELO and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9057

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID SOTELO

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANE R.J.

MAKO SICA FUND LLC FKA VELOCITY PARTNERS FUND LLC

Defendants

KEREKES MICHAEL S.

BDO USA LLP FKA BDO SEIDMAN LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RUGA DYLAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEBORAH E. MCCRIMMON

SANIEFAR LAW

SHINING CAROLIN K. ESQ.

SANIEFAR MOZHGAN

MCCRIMMON DEBORAH ELAINE

HAMMOND KATE MARIE

PIAZZA MICHAEL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

2/28/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

4/19/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

SUBSTITATION OF ATTORNEY

5/10/2018: SUBSTITATION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order -

5/11/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE

5/11/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT HDO USA, LLP'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A.

5/11/2018: DEFENDANT HDO USA, LLP'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL DEADLINES GOVERNED BY THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A.

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSTTION TO BDO USA. LLP'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE

5/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSTTION TO BDO USA. LLP'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JASON GERSTEIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JASON GERSTEIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JASON GERSTEIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

5/24/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JASON GERSTEIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MARGARET H. WARNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

5/24/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. PIAZZA IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MARGARET H. WARNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MARGARET H. WARNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BOO USA, LLP

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MARGARET H. WARNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BOO USA, LLP

Minute Order -

5/25/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

5/29/2018: ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BDO USA, LLP

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mako Sica Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); R.J. Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
276 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketMotion; Filed by Mako Sica Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Velocity Partners Fund, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Mako Sica Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Velocity Partners Fund, LLC (Legacy Party); R.J. Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mako Sica Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mako Sica Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); R.J. Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

'FILED BY FAX (CRC 2005

Dylan Ruga (SBN 235969)

lan Samson (SBN 279393)

STALWART LAW GROUP

1100 Glendon Ave., 17th Fl. o F%% !?2‘ . Los Angeles, CA 90024 aiéfl@? N Telephone: (310) 954-2000 onnty OF Lt dylan@stalwartlaw.com : ) lan@stalwartlaw.com DEC 19 2017

| . hervi R, Carter Bxocuthor €63 r(erk James R. Gilreath (Admitted pro hac vice)

William M. Hogan (Admitted pro hac vice) By_ Gl : g Deputy, THE GILREATH LAW FIRM, PA OFlesia Kibiss ,,

110 Lavinia Ave (zip 29601)

P.O. Box 2147

Greenville, SC 29602-2147

(864) 242-4727, Fax: (864) 232-4395 jim@gilreathlaw.com bhogan@gilreathlaw.com

James A. Roberts, III (Admitted pro hac vice) LEWIS & ROBERTS, PLLC

3700 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 410

Raleigh, NC 27612

(919) 981-0191, Fax: (919) 981-0199 jimrobberts@lewis-roberts.com

| Gary V. Mauney (Admitted pro hac vice)

LEWIS & ROBERTS, PLLC Ny One Southpark Center

6060 Piedmont Row Drive, South; Suite 140

Charlotte, NC 28287

(704) 347-8990, Fax (704) 347-8929

garymauney@lewis-roberts.com

Attorneys for Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

MAKO SICA FUND, LLC, formerly known as Velocity Partners Fund, LLC; and R. J. LANE, Case No.: BC659057 an individual,

Plaintiffs, ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS MAKO SICA FUND, LLC AND R. J. LANE V. TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL S. KEREKES BDO USA, LLP, formerly known as BDO SEIDMAN, LLP; MICHAEL S. KEREKES, an

individual; and DOES 1-10, inclusive. DY L

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BDO SEIDMAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCRIMMON, DEBORAH E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANIEFAR LAW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHINING, CAROLIN K.