This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 04:14:49 (UTC).

MAKENNA MYERS, ET AL. VS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 MAKENNA MYERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8207

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEEKS HEATHER MOULD

STOKES PAULA

BACKMAN AMANDA

RODRIGUEZ COREY

KNIGHT JENNEKA

KNIGHT TRACY

HAIRSTON CATRICE

BROWN CAROL

FORD WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDANT AUNDREA FORD

MYERS MAKENNA

Defendants

MEDTRONIC INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COWPER C. MOZE

COWPER MOZE

Defendant Attorney

TABURA RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Report - DEFENDANTS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S STATUS REPORT

8/17/2021: Status Report - DEFENDANTS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S STATUS REPORT

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 05/27/2021

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 05/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILLIAM FORD PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 337.32

5/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILLIAM FORD PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 337.32

Complaint

5/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDefendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Medtronic, Inc.'s Status Report; Filed by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in California (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff); Paula Stokes (Plaintiff); Heather Mould Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in California (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 4:15 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 05/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff); Paula Stokes (Plaintiff); Heather Mould Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of William Ford Pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. 337.32); Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff); Paula Stokes (Plaintiff); Heather Mould Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff); Paula Stokes (Plaintiff); Heather Mould Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Makenna Myers (Plaintiff); Paula Stokes (Plaintiff); Heather Mould Weeks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TABURA RICHARD