This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 04:49:18 (UTC).

MAHTALAT BARSIASA VS TYTHAN INTERNATIONAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 MAHTALAT BARSIASA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TYTHAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5568

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BARSIASA MAHTALAT

Defendants and Respondents

CERRES JULIO ANTONIO

TYTHAN INTERNATIONAL LLC

GUERRA RAUL ANTONIO ARITA

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DEGRAVE DOUGLAS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/26/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/26/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/26/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

11/2/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/2/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

2/13/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/13/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/27/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

2/27/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

SUMMONS

2/27/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Tythan International LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Tythan International LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Mahtalat Barsiasa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Mahtalat Barsiasa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Julio Antonio Cerres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Julio Antonio Cerres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Raul Antonio Arita Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Raul Antonio Arita Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Answer (to Complaint); Filed by Raul Antonio Arita Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Proof of service of summons; Filed by Mahtalat Barsiasa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Proof of service of summons; Filed by Mahtalat Barsiasa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mahtalat Barsiasa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695568    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MAHTALAT BARSIASA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

TYTHAN INTERNATIONAL, LLC, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC695568

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 7, 2019

Plaintiff, Mahtalat Barsiasa filed this action against Defendants, Tythan International, LLC, Raul Antonio Arita Guerra, and Julio Antonion Cerres for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed the complaint on 2/27/18.  Defendant, Guerra filed an answer on 10/26/18.   Defendant, Cerros filed an answer on 11/02/18.  The Clerk entered Defendant, Tythan’s default on 2/11/19.

No party appeared at the 8/13/19 FSC or the 8/27/19 trial.  On 8/27/19, the Court dismissed the case.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal.  Plaintiff’s attorney declares the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was due to a calendaring error in her office.  The motion is granted.  CCP §473(b).  Notably, Plaintiff gave notice of this motion to Defendants, and Defendants did not file opposition to the motion. 

The Court sets a trial date in three months, on Friday, 2/07/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The Court sets an FSC for Friday, 1/24/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.      

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.