This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 02:11:01 (UTC).

MAHTAB FEYZGOSTAR VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 MAHTAB FEYZGOSTAR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6065

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FEYZGOSTAR MAHTAB

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

1550 WESTWOOD LLC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

DOES 1 TO 100

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

1 STOP MAINTENANCE INC. [DOE1]

FAULT LINE CLEANERS [DOE 1]

THE RADAR COMPANY INC. [DOE 1]

BEST CLEAN INC DBA FAULTLINE CLEANERS SUED AS DOE1

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ROES 1 TO 50

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NIELSEN JOANNE

DUNBAR KEVIN T. ESQ.

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN ESQ.

DUNBAR KEVIN TERRENCE ESQ.

NACHIAPPAN MEENA C

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

NACHIAPPAN MEENA C

CORDAY BRANDON M.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. TWO; ETC

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. TWO; ETC

RULE 3.1345 SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF MAHTAB FEYZGOSTAR TO DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO. TWO

9/21/2018: RULE 3.1345 SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF MAHTAB FEYZGOSTAR TO DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO. TWO

Unknown

10/1/2018: Unknown

Demand for Jury Trial

10/16/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Reply

10/16/2018: Reply

Summons

10/19/2018: Summons

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/23/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Declaration

10/26/2018: Declaration

Order

10/31/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

11/5/2018: Notice of Ruling

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/7/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

ANSWER TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/2/2017: ANSWER TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT 1550 WEST WOOD, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

11/13/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT 1550 WEST WOOD, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ET SEQ; ETC

6/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ET SEQ; ETC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/3/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF POSTING INITIAL JURY FEES

8/23/2017: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF POSTING INITIAL JURY FEES

Unknown

8/31/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/7/2017: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by 1550 Westwood, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by 1550 Westwood, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Roes 1 through 20 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Notice (Ntc of Withdrawal of Answer to Cross-Defendant Cross-Complainant Best Clean, Inc.); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by 1550 Westwood, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (on Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by Best Clean, Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mahtab Feyzgostar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ET SEQ; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC666065    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MAHTAB FEYZGOSTAR,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC666065

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING CROSS-DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 12, 2019

Cross-Defendant, CBRE, Inc. propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 7/12/19. To date, despite multiple extensions of time to respond and attempts to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Cross-Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Cross-Defendant’s motion is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Cross-Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $2385. Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $150/hour. The Court awards the requested 1.5 hours to meet and confer, as efforts were extensive. The Court awards one hour to prepare the form motion to compel. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. Counsel is located in San Diego and seeks to recover seven hours of appearance time; the Court therefore awards three hours of appearance time, as it is not reasonable to require Plaintiff to pay for Cross-Defendant’s choice to retain an attorney outside of Los Angeles County. The Court awards a total of 5.5 hours of attorney time at the rate of $150/hour, for a total of $825 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards the requested $60 filing fee.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Cross-Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $885, within twenty days.

Cross-Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.