Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2019 at 08:47:34 (UTC).

MAHOGANEE DAVIS VS ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 MAHOGANEE DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, PETER A. HERNANDEZ and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6376

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAVIS MAHOGANEE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1-20

JJC PROPERTIES LLC

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

SCOTT ELEVATOR CONSULTANTS

ARNEL COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES

JCC CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SCOTT ELEVATOR CONSULTANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TABONE DEREK L.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

DENTONS US LLP

EILER JAMES

PALMER CHARLES A.

GIRALDO ALEXANDER BEAU

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL (OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) MAILED TO SCOTT ELEVATOR CONSULTANTS)

9/25/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL (OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) MAILED TO SCOTT ELEVATOR CONSULTANTS)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/9/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Case Management Statement

8/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Order - ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;

7/18/2019: Order - ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/12/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/17/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/13/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/15/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

3/18/2019: Answer

DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANYS ANSWERTO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

8/3/2018: DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANYS ANSWERTO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ARNEL COMMERICAL PROPERTIES, SUED AND SERVED AS DOE I TO COMPLAINT OF MAHOGANEE DAVIS

8/29/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ARNEL COMMERICAL PROPERTIES, SUED AND SERVED AS DOE I TO COMPLAINT OF MAHOGANEE DAVIS

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES OF DEFENDANT ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

7/3/2018: REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES OF DEFENDANT ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/16/2018: SUMMONS -

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Scott Elevator Consultants (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Scott Elevator Consultants (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Scott Elevator Consultants (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mahoganee Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL ((OSC Re: Dismissal (Settlement) mailed to Scott Elevator Consultants))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Mahoganee Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Arnel Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Arnel Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Arnel Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mahoganee Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JCC CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIRALDO, ALEXANDER B.