This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2022 at 13:44:15 (UTC).

MAHNAZ ROFEH VS ELLA MARIE PITTS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 MAHNAZ ROFEH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELLA MARIE PITTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9293

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROFEH MAHNAZ

Defendant

PITTS ELLA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/16/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/16/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mahnaz Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mahnaz Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mahnaz Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mahnaz Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR