Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 15:00:46 (UTC).

MAHMOOD MICHAEL AMIN, ET AL. VS ADEL AHADI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 MAHMOOD MICHAEL AMIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADEL AHADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0348

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRIMEX ENTERTAINMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMIN MAHMOOD MICHAEL

Defendants

AHADI ADEL DBA 25BAND

ASKAR TAHMINEH DAVOODI DBA 25BAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEN JERRY J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Hearing08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mahmood Michael Amin (Plaintiff); Primex Entertainment LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mahmood Michael Amin (Plaintiff); Primex Entertainment LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mahmood Michael Amin (Plaintiff); Primex Entertainment LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEN JERRY J.