This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 09:38:02 (UTC).

MAHABALA SHETTY ET AL VS JULLIAN CASSIANIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 MAHABALA SHETTY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JULLIAN CASSIANIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9004

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SHETTY AMITH

SHETTY MAHABALA

SHETTY VIJAY

Defendants and Respondents

STEWART ELAINE CAROL

PUPPIES FOR PARTIES

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

STEWART VIRGIL CRAIG

KENNELS GRETLO

CASSIANIS JULLIAN

PARTIES PUPPIES FOR

KENNELS GRETLO AKA PUPPIES FOR PARTIES AKA PUPPIES FOR PARTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSE DANIEL S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

WILCOX WENDY L. ESQ.

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

WILCOX WENDY LEIGH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/12/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

10/10/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/10/2018: Answer

SUMMONS

6/5/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

6/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mahabala Shetty (Plaintiff); Vijay Shetty (Plaintiff); Amith Shetty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jullian Cassianis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Jullian Cassianis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Elaine Carol Stewart (Defendant); Virgil Craig Stewart (Defendant); Kennels, Gretlo, aka Puppies for Parties (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mahabala Shetty (Plaintiff); Vijay Shetty (Plaintiff); Amith Shetty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILCOX WENDY L. ESQ.