Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:35:42 (UTC).

MAGIC CITY ACES, LLC VS. ADRIENNE RYAN

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MAGIC CITY ACES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ADRIENNE RYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1722

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAGIC CITY ACES LLC

Respondent

RYAN ADRIENNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GILL SANPREET

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/12/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

7/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/14/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/4/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

8/24/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/5/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Request For Copies; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Order; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Petition - Other; Petition Granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Petition; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Magic City Aces, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILL SANPREET