This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 10:16:22 (UTC).

MAGDA KOCH VS LOWE?S HOME CENTERS, LLC., A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 MAGDA KOCH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LOWE S HOME CENTERS, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3021

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOCH MAGDA

Defendants

BUSH JUSTIN

DIBENE ROXAN

GARZARRO ANNE

GILBERT TINA

HANON CAROLEE

LAST NAME UNKNOWN CHRISTOPHER

LOWE?S COMPANIES INC. AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN PROVENANCE

LOWE?S HOME CENTERS LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RIGATTIRE JEFF

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION

TORRES JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRROKNIAN REZA

Defendant Attorneys

DELACRUZ MICHAELA PIZARRO

RODINE JOSHUA A

ROYSDON NICOLE R.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

3/6/2023: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: GAIL PEEPLES, CSR# 11458

3/1/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: GAIL PEEPLES, CSR# 11458

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER JOINDER...)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER JOINDER...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

1/30/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: KERI LOGAN, CSR# 12608

12/19/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: KERI LOGAN, CSR# 12608

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/16/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

12/16/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

12/14/2022: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/14/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION

12/12/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

12/12/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC"S REPLY

12/12/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC"S REPLY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAGDA KOCH ISO OPPOSITION

12/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAGDA KOCH ISO OPPOSITION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT LOWE'S HOME CENTERS. LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

12/6/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT LOWE'S HOME CENTERS. LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AARON J FARKAS ISO OPPOSITION

12/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AARON J FARKAS ISO OPPOSITION

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Proposed order; Signed and Filed by: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: MAGDA KOCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Proposed order: Filed By: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joinder to Motion Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder to Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Order to Stay Proceedings: Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore By: Gail Peeples, CSR# 11458; Filed by: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other Joinder...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MAGDA KOCH (Plaintiff); As to: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); LOWES COMPANIES, INC., an entity of unknown provenance (Defendant); SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MAGDA KOCH (Plaintiff); As to: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); LOWES COMPANIES, INC., an entity of unknown provenance (Defendant); SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MAGDA KOCH (Plaintiff); As to: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); LOWES COMPANIES, INC., an entity of unknown provenance (Defendant); SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MAGDA KOCH (Plaintiff); As to: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant); LOWES COMPANIES, INC., an entity of unknown provenance (Defendant); SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less