This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 17:18:30 (UTC).

MAGDA AGUILAR VS WALMART, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 MAGDA AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4488

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR MAGDA

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUMAN SHAUN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

COLBERT MICHAEL F.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

8/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Answer

6/11/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/11/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/23/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/15/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court); Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Magda Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Magda Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Magda Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT MICHAEL