This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 15:29:24 (UTC).

MAERSK AGENCY U.S.A. INC., AS AGENT FOR CARRIER MAERSK LINE A/S VS GATEWAY DRAYAGE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 MAERSK AGENCY U S A INC , AS AGENT FOR CARRIER MAERSK LINE A/S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GATEWAY DRAYAGE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0042

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAERSK AGENCY U.S.A. INC. AS AGENT FOR CARRIER MAERSK LINE A/S DBA MAERSK LINE

Defendant

GATEWAY DRAYAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maersk Agency U.S.A. Inc., as agent for carrier Maersk Line A/S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maersk Agency U.S.A. Inc., as agent for carrier Maersk Line A/S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maersk Agency U.S.A. Inc., as agent for carrier Maersk Line A/S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maersk Agency U.S.A. Inc., as agent for carrier Maersk Line A/S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.