This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:47:31 (UTC).

MAE SAUNDERS ET AL VS CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MAE SAUNDERS against CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5397

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

SAUNDERS RICHARD

SAUNDERS MAE

Defendants and Respondents

BEVERLY HILLS CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

7/5/2018: ANSWER OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

7/13/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/19/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/16/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

SUMMONS

5/10/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/10/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mae Saunders (Plaintiff); Richard Saunders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Michael Ralph Nebenzahl (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name (and address)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Beverly Hills, City Of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • ANSWER OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Mae Saunders (Plaintiff); Richard Saunders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mae Saunders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mae Saunders (Plaintiff); Richard Saunders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705397    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 29

Saunders et al. v. City of Beverly Hills

Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates, Including Discovery Cut-Offs is GRANTED.

Good cause having been shown, the Court continues the trial to June 10, 2020. The final status conference is set for May 27, 2020. Motion and discovery cut off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the parties. The Court presumes that the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

The parties must diligently prepare for trial, including the completion of expert discovery, even if they are hopeful that the case will settle.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.