Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 18:57:29 (UTC).

MAE K. MOORE VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 MAE K MOORE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5513

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE MAE K.

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC.

ELIZABETH ARDEN INC.

RITE AID CORP

CHANEL INC.

ESTEE LAUDER INC.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

PFIZER INC.

CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

ESTEE LAUDER INTERNATIONAL INC.

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

STIEFEL LABORATORIES INC.

REVLON INC.

MACY'S INC.

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS BENJAMIN H

Defendant Attorneys

HENGESBACH SCOTT L.

KOHN ANDREW N.

LEE JAE HONG

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

GARRATT JUSTIN EDWARD

MURDICA JAMES F.

CALFO ALEXANDER GERARD

D'ORO FRANK JOSEPH JR

AMEELE KEITH MICHAEL

WEISS LINDSAY

ULLOA EDWARD RICHARD

MURRIN CHARLES PATRICK

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

MARTIN NICOLAS PETER

ONGARO DAVID RAYMOND

VAN DAM TINA BROCCARDO

RIDLEY SHAWN M.

SMITH TRAVIS R.

KING DOUGLAS B.

 

Court Documents

Notice - DEFENDANT AVON PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

5/4/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT AVON PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Notice - DEFENDANT AVON PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY IN ITS ENTIRETY OR PORTIONS THEREOF

5/4/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT AVON PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY IN ITS ENTIRETY OR PORTIONS THEREOF

Notice - NOTICE THAT MOTION TO QUASH BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC ARE OFF CALENDAR; PROOF OF SERVICE

5/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE THAT MOTION TO QUASH BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC ARE OFF CALENDAR; PROOF OF SERVICE

Answer

5/5/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF ALISON COONEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

5/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF ALISON COONEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICOLE C. DELGADO ISO VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISON COONEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

5/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICOLE C. DELGADO ISO VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISON COONEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERS...)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERS...)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Answer

4/8/2021: Answer

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Answer

3/23/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Other - - COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (VOL. 4 OF 9)

2/9/2021: Other - - COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (VOL. 4 OF 9)

Other - - COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (VOL. 7 OF 9)

2/9/2021: Other - - COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (VOL. 7 OF 9)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Application of Alison Cooney to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Defendants Estee Lauder Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies Inc., and Estee Lauder International, Inc. (Moore-21STCV05513)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Application of Alison Cooney to Appear as ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Application of Travis R. Smith to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Take Part in Case With Local Counsel; Filed by Travis R. Smith (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Douglas B. King in Support of Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company's Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Application of Douglas B. King to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Take Part in Case With Local Counsel; Filed by Douglas B. King (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Travis R. Smith in Support of Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company's Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury in its Entirety or Portions Thereof on Behalf of Defendant Avon Products Inc. (Moore-21STCV05513)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury on Behalf of Defendant Avon Products (Moore-21STCV05513)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 4 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 5 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 6 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 7 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 8 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 9 of 9); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint (for Personal Injury - Asbestos (Vol. 1 of 9)); Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mae K. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elizabeth Arden Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Family Dollar Store #11898 is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC. is a litigant