This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 01:45:44 (UTC).

MADISONIAN FILMS LLC VS 8 FILMS TO DIE FOR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 MADISONIAN FILMS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 8 FILMS TO DIE FOR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5172

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADISONIAN FILMS LLC

Defendants

CINELOU HOLDINGS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AFTER DARK FILMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

8 FILMS TO DIE FOR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOLOMON COURTNEY AN INDIVIDUAL

CINELOU FILMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AUTONOMOUS FILMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOLOMON COURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORRIS MATTHEW J.

Defendant Attorneys

STUART GORDON

TAYLOR BENJAMIN SAMUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 15:00 PM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 49; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 8 FILMS TO DIE FOR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); AFTER DARK FILMS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); AUTONOMOUS FILMS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 8 FILMS TO DIE FOR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); AFTER DARK FILMS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); AUTONOMOUS FILMS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MADISONIAN FILMS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV35172    Hearing Date: March 25, 2021    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Madisonian Films LLC,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

19STCV35172

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

8 Films to Die For, LLC, et al.

Defendants.

Hearing Date: March 25, 2021

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

Pro Hac Vice Applications of Emilio B. Nicolas and Michael C. Roberts

Moving Party: Attorneys Emilio B. Nicolas and Michael C. Roberts

Responding Party: none

Ruling: The pro hac vice applications are granted.

Attorneys Emilio B. Nicholas and Michael C. Roberts apply for permission to appear as counsel pro hac vice for Plaintiff Madisonian Films, LLC. Nicolas and Roberts meet all the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 9.40. (Roberts Decl.; Nicolas Decl.) Further, both have paid the $50 fee to the State Bar and provided notice to the State Bar. (Roberts Decl. ¶ 10; Nicolas Decl. ¶ 10.) Therefore, the proposed orders to allow Nicolas and Roberts to appear pro hac vice on Plaintiff’s behalf will be signed and filed forthwith.

Date: March 25, 2021

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINELOU FILMS LLC is a litigant