This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 10:10:03 (UTC).

MADISON TAYLOR SIWIAK, ET AL. VS BECKIE VI VUONG

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 MADISON TAYLOR SIWIAK, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BECKIE VI VUONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2038

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SIWIAK JAMES

SIWIAK MADISON TAYLOR

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

VUONG BECKIE VI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEHME ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

ASLANIAN ARPIE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DELINKO DAVID F

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/30/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/23/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

12/23/2022: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant); As to: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant); As to: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff); As to: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant); Service Date: 10/29/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff); As to: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff); As to: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Madison Taylor Siwiak (Plaintiff); James Siwiak (Plaintiff); As to: Beckie Vi Vuong (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASLANIAN ARPIE