This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 03:32:36 (UTC).

MADHY A FLORES ET AL VS WILLIAM ALEXANDER WILLITTS

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 MADHY A FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAM ALEXANDER WILLITTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4140

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

FLORES MAHDY A.

FLORES ARTURO

FLORES DIANA

Respondents and Defendants

WILLITTS WILLIAM ALEXANDER

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

INNABI AMER

WANGLER JOSEPH JACOB

Defendant Attorney

BUTLER AIDAN W

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/12/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

11/22/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

11/22/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO...)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Witness List

10/15/2021: Witness List

Exhibit List

10/15/2021: Exhibit List

Trial Brief

10/15/2021: Trial Brief

Statement of the Case

10/15/2021: Statement of the Case

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

6/8/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Proof of Service by Mail

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

Proof of Service by Mail

6/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

6/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

6/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

7/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...) OF 07/09/2021

7/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...) OF 07/09/2021

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Pursuant to Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Pursuant to...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial Pursuant to Stipulation); Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff); Arturo Flores (Plaintiff); Diana Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff); Arturo Flores (Plaintiff); Diana Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff); Arturo Flores (Plaintiff); Diana Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mahdy A. Flores (Plaintiff); Arturo Flores (Plaintiff); Diana Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC694140 Hearing Date: July 9, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MAHDY A. FLORES, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

WILLIAM ALEXANDER WILLITTS, et al.

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: BC694140

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Dept. 27

10:00 a.m.

July 9, 2021

The Law Offices of Marc Grossman, APC seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Mahdy A. Flores on grounds that there has been a breakdown in communication. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)

Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The Court notes that trial in this matter is not yet set and no prejudice will result from granting this motion. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

Dated this 9th day of July 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

'

Case Number: BC694140    Hearing Date: June 3, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MAHDY FLORES,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

WILLIAM ALEXANDER WILLITTS,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC694140

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

June 3, 2021

The Law Offices of Marc Grossman, APC seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Mahdy A. Flores on the grounds that there has been a breakdown in communication.   

Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted.  (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)  However, this Motion, declaration, and proposed order must be served on the client and all other parties who have appeared in the case.  (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(d).)  There is no indication that Defendant William Willitts has been served.  Furthermore, even if all parties had been served, neither the motion, declaration, nor proposed order have a hearing date or time identified on them and therefore there was no proper notice given of this hearingAccordingly, this Motion to be relieved is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 3rd day of June 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANGLER JOSEPH JACOB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INNABI AMER