This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 18:53:41 (UTC).

MADELEINE GORYL, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, GERARD GORYL VS ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 MADELEINE GORYL, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, GERARD GORYL filed an Other lawsuit against ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0807

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORYL BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST GERARD GORYL MADELEINE

Defendants

ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC

ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL INC.

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MADELEINE GORYL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

6/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MADELEINE GORYL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

7/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST); Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (of remote appearance); Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF GERARD GORYL AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MADELEINE GORYL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32); Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Madeleine Goryl, by and through her Successor in Interest, Gerard Goryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL