This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 13:54:57 (UTC).

MACY LAI VS CHRIS AU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 MACY LAI filed an Other lawsuit against CHRIS AU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1300

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAI MACY

Defendants

AU CHRIS

TAY DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELKONIAN GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CHRIS AU)

8/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CHRIS AU)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DOLORES TAY)

8/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DOLORES TAY)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

8/2/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Dolores Tay)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Chris Au)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Macy Lai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Macy Lai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Macy Lai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Macy Lai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELKONIAN GEOFFREY