Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 13:53:01 (UTC).

MACRINA GARCIA VS JOHN FAITASIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 MACRINA GARCIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN FAITASIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0174

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MACRINA

Defendants

FAITASIA JOHN AKA JOHN THURSDAYFRIDAYSATURDAY AKA JOHN SEVENDAYS

FELT HOME CARE LLC DBA LIFESAVERS AT HOME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLEMAN JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Macrina Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Macrina Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Macrina Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN JONATHAN