This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 21:34:16 (UTC).

MACKEY, RUBYE J. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MACKEY, RUBYE J - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3251

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MACKEY EUGENE A.

RIZO CLPF VICTORIA

Assignee

INHERITANCE ADVANCED LLC

Decedent

MACKEY RUBYE J.

Interested Parties

ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC.

LEESTMA JAMES L

Other

MACKEY ELISCHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KWAN VERLAN YUENEN

Interested Party Attorney

LEESTMA JAMES LAMBERT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

8/17/2021: Proof of Publication

Consent

8/18/2021: Consent

Minute Order

8/24/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance

9/27/2021: Notice - Continuance

Minute Order

10/28/2021: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

11/15/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

12/1/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Assignment - MACKEY JR EUGENE ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

7/23/2021: Assignment - MACKEY JR EUGENE ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/26/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Assignment - EDDIE FORKERWAY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

7/19/2021: Assignment - EDDIE FORKERWAY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

Assignment - TERENCE TOY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

7/21/2021: Assignment - TERENCE TOY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

Assignment - ELISCHA MACKEY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

7/16/2021: Assignment - ELISCHA MACKEY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

Assignment - MYRON MACKEY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

7/19/2021: Assignment - MYRON MACKEY ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANCE ADVANCED

Minute Order

7/13/2021: Minute Order

Withdrawal - Notice of Withdrawal of Petition for Probate of Will and Letters

7/9/2021: Withdrawal - Notice of Withdrawal of Petition for Probate of Will and Letters

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

7/9/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

Assignment

6/28/2021: Assignment

Substitution of Attorney

6/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketObjection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Special Admin w/Gen Powers (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INHERITANCE ADVANCED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC is a litigant