This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2022 at 04:36:39 (UTC).

MACK GOLDSBURY, ET AL. VS TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 MACK GOLDSBURY, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5602

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOLDSBURY JANET

GOLDSBURY MACK

Defendants

SY DEOMARLEE

SY ESTELITA

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAKIZ J. DEREK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2024
  • Hearing12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mack Goldsbury (Plaintiff); Janet Goldsbury (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mack Goldsbury (Plaintiff); Janet Goldsbury (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mack Goldsbury (Plaintiff); Janet Goldsbury (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKIZ J. DEREK ESQ.