This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 15:26:27 (UTC).

MACIAS GINI & OCONNELL LLP VS DBO INVESTMENTS PH, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 MACIAS GINI OCONNELL LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DBO INVESTMENTS PH, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8018

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACIAS GINI & OCONNELL LLP

Defendants

CALLE VERDE LLC

CBD INC

DBO INVESTMENTS LB LLC

DBO INVESTMENTS PH LLC

DHS VERDE LLC

FROM THE EARTH DISPENSARY JOINT VENTURE

FROM THE EARTH INC.

FROM THE EARTH LLC

FTE MANAGEMENT LLC

GLOBAL GROWTH INVESTMENTS LLC

HUENEME PARTNERS LLC

NEW CO JOINT VENT.

URBAN COMMONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/1/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Macias Gini & OConnell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Macias Gini & OConnell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Macias Gini & OConnell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHS VERDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where From The Earth LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINASSIAN NATALIA