This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 23:11:59 (UTC).

MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS THE GAP, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE GAP, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9199

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE GAP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORMAN GREGORY

Defendant Attorney

QUAZZO MARCO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Order - ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT OBLIGATIONS

1/8/2021: Order - ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT OBLIGATIONS

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT OBLIGATIONS

1/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT OBLIGATIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

1/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Notice of Settlement

1/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/23/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY S. KORMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY S. KORMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/23/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

10/23/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

9/3/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

9/3/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/3/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Cross-Complaint

9/21/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Request for Dismissal); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Staying Action Pending Performance of Settlement Obligations); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Staying Action Pending Performance of Settlement Obligations); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (and Joint Request for 90 Day Stay Pending Performance of Settlement Obligations); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 4:07 PM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff Macerich Cerritos, LLC's Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE GAP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by THE GAP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUAZZO, MARCO