This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 12:22:11 (UTC).

MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS TAPESTRY, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TAPESTRY, INC , A MARYLAND CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5820

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MACERICH SMP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

TAPESTRY INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KORMAN GREGORY S.

MACZEK MEEGAN ISABELLE

LARSEN RYAN JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HUANG JESSICA H.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/2/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

3/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/17/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO TAKE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT

2/17/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO TAKE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT

Case Management Statement

2/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

2/23/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

2/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, FOR RIGHT T...)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, FOR RIGHT T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERICE

1/5/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERICE

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

10/19/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF W

10/19/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF W

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/22/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

9/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for entry of default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, FOR RIGHT T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment); Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT); Filed by Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Macerich Cerritos, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); Macerich SMP LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACERICH SMP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where TAPESTRY INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUANG JESSICA H.