This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2020 at 19:51:17 (UTC).

MACARIO, FREDY ANIBAL VS IXCOT, MIRNA FRANCISCA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MACARIO, FREDY ANIBAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against IXCOT, MIRNA FRANCISCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2236

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACARIO FREDY ANIBAL

Respondent

IXCOT MIRNA FRANCISCA

 

Court Documents

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Whittier

12/5/2019: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Whittier

Proof of Service of Summons

12/5/2019: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

12/5/2019: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Separate Property

12/5/2019: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

12/5/2019: Declaration - Income and Expense

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

12/5/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/5/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

12/5/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

12/5/2019: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/5/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Default FL170

2/5/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Request - Enter Default FL165

2/5/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Judgment

2/13/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

2/13/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.