This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:28:26 (UTC).

MABLE JONES VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPART OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 MABLE JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPART OF MOTOR VEHICLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT, DENNIS J. LANDIN and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8443

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DENNIS J. LANDIN

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JONES MABLE

Defendants and Respondents

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPART OF MOTOR

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HARRISON BRYAN J. ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GREENE JOHN D. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine

10/25/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

10/25/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

11/5/2018: Motion in Limine

Jury Instructions

11/14/2018: Jury Instructions

Motion in Limine

11/15/2018: Motion in Limine

Exhibit List

11/15/2018: Exhibit List

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

Other -

12/4/2018: Other -

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

12/4/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Jury Question

12/14/2018: Jury Question

Minute Order

5/8/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY/NEGLIGENCE, ETC

4/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY/NEGLIGENCE, ETC

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES; ETC.

7/5/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES; ETC.

Minute Order

8/15/2017: Minute Order

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F43; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • at 3:06 PM in Department F43; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Correcting Minute Order Dated May 16, 201...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of 05/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F51; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 1:21 PM in Department F43; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Reassigning and Continuing Motion to Tax or Strik...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Reassigning and Continuing Motion to Tax or Strik...) of 05/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GREENE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX OR STRIKE COSTS); Filed by State of California Depart of Motor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by State of California Depart of Motor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GREENE RE MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(3) RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Mable Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mable Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mable Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY/NEGLIGENCE, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC658443    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On April 19, 2017, Plaintiff Mable Jones filed a complaint against Defendant State of California Department of Motor Vehicles for premises liability/negligence and negligence per se.  On June 6, 2017, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint, removing the negligence per se cause of action.  On October 13, 2017, Plaintiff filed a Second Amended Complaint.

On January 10, 2019, after jury trial, judgment was entered against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant.

On September 24, 2019, Plaintiff’s counsel, Bryan J. Harrison and Edi Kristopher of Harrison Kristopher, LLP filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff’s counsel, Bryan J. Harrison and Edi Kristopher of Harrison Kristopher, LLP, seek a court order relieving them as counsel for Plaintiff Mable Jones in this matter.

LEGAL STANDARD

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Counsel has submitted forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 in seeking to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Mable Jones.

Counsel states in the declaration that counsel can no longer continue to represent Plaintiff and that the retainer agreement signed by Plaintiff does not cover post-judgment proceedings.

Counsel has served the operative notice of motion, motion and declaration on Plaintiff and Defendant by U.S. mail.  Counsel has confirmed Plaintiff’s last known address within the past thirty days through a public records search.

The Court finds that counsel has complied with CRC Rule 3.1362.  The Court also finds that the granting of this motion will not prejudice Plaintiff, given trial has already occurred and judgment has been entered.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED.

Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.