This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 12:56:54 (UTC).

MAATOUK, JIHAD VS FAYYAD, JANAN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 MAATOUK, JIHAD filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against FAYYAD, JANAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RIFF, LAWRENCE P., KAUFMAN, SHELLEY and PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0003

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAATOUK JIHAD

Respondent

FAYYAD JANAN

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARCUS DAVID L

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Hebeas Corpus

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Hebeas Corpus

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - for Return of Minor Child to Petitioner Under The Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon

9/13/2021: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - for Return of Minor Child to Petitioner Under The Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon

Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor Child under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction

9/13/2021: Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor Child under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - For a Warrant in Lieu of a Writ of Hebeas Corpus

9/13/2021: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - For a Warrant in Lieu of a Writ of Hebeas Corpus

Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

Proof of Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

11/16/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation

12/14/2021: Stipulation

Minute Order

12/14/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/27/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

12/27/2021

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Off Calendar - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021

DocketStipulation; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Hebeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor Child under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (For a Warrant in Lieu of a Writ of Hebeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (for Return of Minor Child to Petitioner Under The Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less