This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2023 at 05:11:46 (UTC).

MA ERNESTINA GALVAN PADILLA VS ACE RELOCATION SYSTEMS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 MA ERNESTINA GALVAN PADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACE RELOCATION SYSTEMS, INC OF WASHINGTON, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1656

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALVAN PADILLA MA ERNESTINA

Defendants

ACE RELOCATION SYSTEMS INC. OF WASHINGTON A CORPORATION

ATLAS VAN LINES INC. CORPORATION

SMITH PHILLIP JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OMIDFAR DELAVAR

Defendant Attorney

GREEN VINCENT S.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/5/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/5/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/5/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2023
  • Hearing12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Phillip Smith, Jr (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ace Relocation Systems, Inc. of Washington, a corporation (Defendant); Atlas Van Lines, Inc., corporation (Defendant); Phillip Smith, Jr (Defendant); As to: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Atlas Van Lines, Inc., corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/09/2022; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Relocation Systems, Inc. of Washington, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/06/2022; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Relocation Systems, Inc. of Washington, a corporation (Defendant); Atlas Van Lines, Inc., corporation (Defendant); Phillip Smith, Jr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Relocation Systems, Inc. of Washington, a corporation (Defendant); Atlas Van Lines, Inc., corporation (Defendant); Phillip Smith, Jr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ma Ernestina Galvan Padilla (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Relocation Systems, Inc. of Washington, a corporation (Defendant); Atlas Van Lines, Inc., corporation (Defendant); Phillip Smith, Jr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less