This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 22:08:59 (UTC).

MA CIELO MATE VS JERRY STAFFING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 MA CIELO MATE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JERRY STAFFING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0073

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATE MA CIELO

Defendants

JERRY STAFFING INC

THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAH EARTH

Defendant Attorney

CHU SELWYN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/26/2021;)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/26/2021;)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

7/20/2021: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ma Cielo Mate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jerry Staffing, inc (Defendant); The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 3:23 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/26/2021;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ma Cielo Mate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ma Cielo Mate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ma Cielo Mate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant